Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Chang, Clark, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of certain security breach investigation and notification requirements to certain businesses; prohibiting a certain business from charging a certain owner or licensee of computerized data a fee for providing information that the owner or licensee needs to provide a certain notification; prohibiting a certain owner or licensee from using certain information for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163199/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {163199/1 Adopted 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Reassigned to Finance 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-3504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page