Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Clark, Rose, Shoemaker, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member or an ex officio member of the Workgroup from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to obtain certain information and recommendations, meet on a certain schedule, and conduct reviews of certain fire and explosion investigations performed by certain public agencies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page