Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Facilities - Siting Standards
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a solar facility may be allowed only by special exception in certain zones of a local jurisdiction; establishing certain requirements for the application, siting, and operation of a solar facility in certain zones; establishing certain limitations on the siting of a solar facility in certain zones; requiring certain approval to be obtained from certain persons before approval of a certain solar facility in certain zones; prohibiting a solar facility from being located in certain districts or areas; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solar Facilities - Siting Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Solar Facilities - Siting Standards
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-401, 7-501 through 7-508 )
(   7-207, 7-207.1, 7-207.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM