Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Flanagan, Healey, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, and Morhaim
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, to conduct a specified study related to the public oyster fishery; requiring the Department to identify specified oyster management strategies in a specified manner; requiring the Department to submit its final report to the Governor, the Oyster Advisory Commission, and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; providing that the Act does not limit the Department's ability to manage the oyster fishery; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {170915/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {170915/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM