Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified county boards of education to remove a county superintendent of schools under specified circumstances; requiring a county superintendent who has been removed to be compensated subject to the terms of a specified contract or, if no such terms exist, for the remainder of the county superintendent's term.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM