Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Generic Drugs and Medical Supplies Purchasing Cooperative Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a workgroup to study the advisability of the State, along with hospitals, pharmacies, health care facilities and private medical practices, forming a generic drugs and medical supplies purchasing cooperative; requiring that the workgroup include specified individuals; requiring the workgroup to make recommendations regarding specified matters and report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1126
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health - Generic Drugs and Medical Supplies Purchasing Cooperative Workgroup
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM