Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen and Gibson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the State Department of Education to establish child care centers for the children of State employees in State-occupied buildings under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to survey certain employees and make certain determinations under certain circumstances before the State renovates a certain building; and repealing the pilot program for child care in State-occupied buildings and State complexes.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-501, 9.5-502, 9.5-503, 9.5-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM