Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - HVAC Energy Efficiency Technology
Sponsored by
Delegate Hixson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of specified HVAC energy efficiency technology installed on or after January 1, 2016; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring a taxpayer claiming the credit to attach proof of the total installed costs to the taxpayer's return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM