Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Reznik, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Jones, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, and McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Temporary Disability Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services; requiring the Family Investment Administration to be the central coordinating and directing agency of the Program; requiring the Program to be administered by the local departments of social services in a certain manner; specifying the requirements for entitlement to assistance under the Program; requiring the monthly allowable assistance under the Program to equal at least $215 in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187872/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884060/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {187872/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text - Chapter - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
(   5-201, 5-205, 5-5B-01 through 5-5B-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page