Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Veterans Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Adding a member of the Military Order of the World Wars to the Maryland Veterans Commission.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-915, 9-917 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM