Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen, Angel, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account to be used for substance use treatment, with priority given to residential treatment services, recovery support housing, and specified crisis response services, and for rate adjustments for specified agencies or programs; requiring specified distributions from the account to be used to supplement and not supplant specified other funds; prohibiting more than $10,000,000 from being appropriated from the account in any fiscal year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709530/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {709530/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted (33-13) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM