Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic Districts
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan and P. Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the 3-day period from July 28, 2017, through July 30, 2017, to be a tax-free period for shopping in the Ellicott City Historic District and the Ellicott's Mills Historic District during which a specified sales and use tax exemption shall apply, if the taxable price of the item is $100 or less.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic Districts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-233 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM