Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Highways - Heroes Highway
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Adams, Afzali, Anderson, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Beitzel, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Busch, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Carter, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McIntosh, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, O'Donnell, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Vogt, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate the portion of Maryland Route 924 (Emmorton Road) between its intersections with Maryland Route 24 and Singer Road as Heroes Highway.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM