Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elected and Public Officials - Crimes - Pension Forfeiture (Clean Up Annapolis Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Miele
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain officials indicted and convicted for certain crimes to reimburse the State for any expenses or per diem spent or reimbursement paid to the official after the official is indicted; establishing that an individual employed in a certain position who is convicted of a certain crime is subject to forfeiture of pension benefits; altering certain provisions of law relating to the forfeiture of benefits from the State Retirement and Pension System for certain public employees; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
29
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Text - First - Elected and Public Officials - Crimes - Pension Forfeiture (Clean Up Annapolis Act)
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Appropriations 29
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-701, 21-702, 21-703, 21-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM