Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Morales, Ali, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to disclose certain personal information to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement only after being provided with a valid warrant or subpoena issued by a federal court or a court of this State;
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM