Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsored by
Delegate Hettleman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that a certain patient privilege does not exist for certain records and certain testimony of a psychiatrist or licensed psychologist, a psychiatric-mental health nursing specialist or professional counselor, or a licensed certified social worker related to suspected child abuse and neglect in certain civil proceedings under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109, 9-109.1, 9-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM