Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Boteler, Buckel, Hornberger, Krebs, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain retirement income attributable to certain out-of-state employment as a correctional officer, law enforcement officer, or fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1030
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:43 PM