Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Clarifying that the calculation of extraordinary medical expenses for the purposes of determining a parental child support obligation under the child support guidelines includes the cumulative contributions of both parents.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:43 PM