Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding changes in policies, practices, or capital expenditures in order to address issues involving the restraint and search of children within the juvenile justice system; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322419/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {322419/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM