Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Clinically Integrated Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegate Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "clinically integrated organization" for purposes of provisions of law governing contracts between specified health insurance carriers and clinically integrated organizations and the sharing of specified medical information by the health insurance carriers with clinically integrated organizations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Hayes) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Hayes) Adopted (131-0) 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 41
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM