Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, J. Lewis, McComas, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, except as otherwise provided by law, the Public Information Act does not authorize a custodian of records to allow the inspection of the Social Security number or date of birth of an individual except to a person in interest; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a custodian to deny inspection of a certain part of a personal surveillance video; requiring that a victim who is the subject of a record that is denied inspection be notified of all requests to inspect the record; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0788
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Information Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Public Information Act - Revisions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-103, 4-327.1, 4-341 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM