Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a reference to a specified public transportation provider in Carroll County from the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Krebs) Adopted (135-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Krebs) Adopted (135-1) 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 43
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58A
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM