Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Contributions to the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Frush, Gutierrez, Healey, Jones, Kaiser, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, McComas, McIntosh, Pendergrass, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a certain taxpayer to claim a certain credit against the State income tax for certain contributions during the taxable year to the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund; requiring a certain reduction of itemized deductions if the credit is claimed under certain circumstances; providing that any unused credit may be carried forward to succeeding taxable years, subject to certain limitations; establishing the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Contributions to the Maryland Excellence in Education Fund
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-218, 10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM