Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Aumann, Hettleman, Morhaim, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to transfer a Class B or Class D beer, wine, and liquor (on-sale) retail alcoholic beverages license in existence in Election District 15 to a specified location; requiring that the transferred license be converted into a Class B (MSF)(on-sale) beer, wine, and liquor license; prohibiting a Class B (MSF) license issued under the Act from being transferred to a location outside a specified area or converted into another class of license; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate West) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273393/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate West) Adopted (135-0) 53
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {273393/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-1709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM