Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program in the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to administer the Grant Program to provide grants and contracts on a competitive basis to fund certain programs; requiring the Grant Program to provide certain funding to a program at a certain level if federal funding is discontinued for the program; providing for the funding of the Grant Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM