Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk and West
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an applicant, in order to qualify as a certified supervised counselor-alcohol and drug, to complete supervised work experience as specified in regulation in lieu of satisfying a specified internship requirement.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 10:30 PM (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (138-0) 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 10:30 PM (Senator Hough) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Norman) Adopted 63A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM