Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Barron, and Lam
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to include psychiatrists who are providing Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in the types of providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Program recipients; and requiring the Department to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by September 30, 2020, on the effect of certain reimbursements.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876788/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {876788/1 Adopted 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM