Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Hayes, Morales, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, M. Washington, A. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Center for School Safety to make grants for specified security-related projects to schools and child care centers determined to be at risk of specified crimes or attacks; authorizing specified schools or child care centers to apply to the Center for a specified State grant; establishing the terms and conditions for the use of specified State grant funds by specified recipients; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (135-0) 44
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44
Text - First - Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {565668/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-305 )
(   7-1502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM