Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses - Annual Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $2,500 to $5,000, the maximum amount allowed in a taxable year as a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for advance payments of certain qualified higher education expenses made by an account holder or a contributor under a Maryland Prepaid College Trust contract; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses - Annual Limitation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM