Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for a certain amount of donations to certain qualified permanent endowment funds at certain institutions of higher education; providing for the carryforward of the credit; requiring the Comptroller, on application of a taxpayer, to issue a tax credit certificate; requiring the application to contain certain information; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM