Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years Old
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a homeowner who is at least 70 years old under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of, eligibility for, and application of the credit; providing that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is responsible for certain administrative duties with respect to the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {645461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years Old
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {645461/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Walker) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-245, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page