Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the inheritance tax; and applying the Act to decedents dying after December 31, 2017.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Repeal
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-201 through 7-204, 7-207 through 7-211, 7-214 through 7-221, 7-224, 7-225, 7-228, 7-231 through 7-234 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page