Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescription Monitoring Data - Insurance Carriers
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to disclose prescription drug monitoring data, in accordance with certain regulations, to certain insurance carriers for determining the medical necessity of a prescription drug claim, enhancing or coordinating patient care, or assisting the treating provider's clinical decision making.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescription Monitoring Data - Insurance Carriers
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM