Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "personal information" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing the protection of information by government agencies to exclude voter registration numbers.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {235862/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Election Law – Voter Registration Lists and Voter Registration Numbers (Voter Registration List Protection Act)
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {235862/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text - Chapter - State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page