Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Gilchrist, Knotts, Lafferty, R. Lewis, McCray, Moon, Robinson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a civil penalty of up to $25 for a video toll violation to be assessed 15 days after the violation occurs.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0611 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1414 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM