Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount available for a purse for the Maryland International thoroughbred race by specifying the amount is up to $500,000; specifying that the Maryland International is a graded stakes race; authorizing the Maryland International to continue to be conducted after June 30, 2019; requiring that certain money distributed to the Racing Special Fund and paid for certain purposes remain available for those purposes and may not be used for any other purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text - Chapter - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-403, 11-522.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM