Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an inmate participating in a work-release arrangement in Charles County to pay court-ordered restitution and certain food, lodging, electronic monitoring, and clothing costs; requiring the Charles County Sheriff to establish certain per diem rates and designate an agent to collect the costs; and requiring the Sheriff's designee to deliver certain amounts collected to the county treasurer.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802519/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {802519/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page