Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, Brooks, Cluster, Hettleman, Jalisi, Miele, Morhaim, Sydnor, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore County annually to spend, from the fines collected as a result of violations enforced by speed monitoring systems in school zones, up to $5,000 per public high school for after-prom parties.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1196
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM