Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsored by
Delegates Carozza, P. Young, Reznik, Vogt, Wilson, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "veteran" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing veteran-owned small business enterprise participation in procurement to include only individuals who are verified by the State Department of Veterans Affairs as having served on active duty in the armed forces of the United States, other than for training, and were discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406787/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {406787/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Text - Third - Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM