Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response Program - Dispensing of Naloxone by Paramedics
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a paramedic, subject to certain rules, regulations, protocols, orders, and standards, to dispense naloxone in a nonemergency environment in accordance with the Overdose Response Program; providing that a paramedic who dispenses naloxone in accordance with the Program is not subject to any disciplinary action by the EMS Board; authorizing a paramedic to dispense naloxone to certain individuals; providing that a certain cause of action may not arise against a paramedic under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health - Overdose Response Program - Dispensing of Naloxone by Paramedics
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-516 )
(   13-3101, 13-3102, 13-3106, 13-3108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM