Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Morales, Platt, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, K. Young, R. Lewis, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, managed care organizations, dental plans, and certain entities or persons to be subject to a certain assessment in calendar year 2019; providing the assessment's purpose to recoup the aggregate amount of a certain insurer provider fee as a bridge to stability in the individual health insurance market; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to distribute the assessment to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226683/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {443622/1 (Delegate R. Lewis) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-47)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-48)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Care Access Program - Establishment (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {226683/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {443622/1 (Delegate R. Lewis) Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (91-47) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {277275/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 58
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-48) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1202, 15-1301, 6-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM