Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula used to apportion income to the State for certain corporations that carry on a trade or business within and outside the State; authorizing certain corporations to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income; requiring certain corporations to apportion certain income from certain intangible investments in a certain manner; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1252 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {985565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {203722/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (61-66)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {525862/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {985565/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {203722/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (61-66) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {525862/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text - Chapter - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page