Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Credit for Long–Term Care Premiums
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Arentz, Beidle, Carey, Chang, Clark, Fisher, Malone, McConkey, Saab, Sophocleus, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; repealing a prohibition on claiming the credit if an individual was covered by long-term care insurance any time before July 1, 2000; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Credit for Long–Term Care Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Income Tax – Credit for Long–Term Care Premiums
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-718 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM