Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Sanchez
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from cheating at a certain game; prohibiting a person from altering or misrepresenting the outcome of a certain game under certain circumstances; prohibiting a person from placing, increasing, or decreasing a bet or determining the course of certain play after acquiring certain knowledge; prohibiting a person from claiming, collecting, or taking or attempting to claim, collect, or take money or anything of value in or from a certain game, with intent to defraud, under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1254
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Judiciary
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-401 through 12-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM