Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor and Carozza
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence so as to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more minors at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out; altering and establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001, 4-102, 4-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM