Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commitment to Education Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring money in the Education Trust Fund to be expended in a certain manner in certain fiscal years; requiring certain percentages of the money in the Education Trust Fund to be supplemental to funding for certain programs and formulas beginning in fiscal year 2020; and prohibiting the use of certain funds on school construction projects that the State has approved for planning and for which a local education agency has paid some portion of the State share with local funds.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1258
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-1)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commitment to Education Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-1) 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Commitment to Education Act of 2018
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-30 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM