Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Schools Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to employ a designated security administrator; requiring each county board to prepare a school emergency plan for all public schools in the county; requiring each county board to perform a safety assessment of each public school in the county each year; requiring each county board to establish a school threat assessment team; establishing the Safe Schools Fund to provide grants to county boards for the implementation of approved school emergency plans; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Schools Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Safe Schools Act of 2018
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 7-1501, 7-1502, 7-1503 through 7-1505, 7-1601 through 7-1605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM