Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Conaway, Hayes, and Mosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program at Baltimore City Community College, Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, and the University of Maryland Eastern Shore to train students in computer networking and cybersecurity; requiring the Governor for fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter to include in the annual State operating budget an appropriation of $2,500,000 for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to provide grants to certain institutions in the State for the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0615
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134768/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-1) 42
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42
Text - First - Coppin State University and Morgan State University - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {134768/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text - Chapter - Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 through 11-1406, 11-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM