Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali and M. Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing certain reimbursement; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and to make recommendations regarding whether to disband or reform the Department and to recommend improvements to the operations of the Department to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Ali) Adopted (125-3)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Ali) Adopted (125-3) 43A
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 43A
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM