Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct Offenses Relating to Weapons - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Public Schools Superintendent to submit a certain report on student misconduct offenses relating to weapons to the Baltimore County Delegation to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018, and each year thereafter; and requiring the report to include the number of misconduct offenses relating to weapons committed by a student at each public school in Baltimore County during a certain period of time.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted (125-5)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted (126-2)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted (125-5) 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted (126-2) 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Ways and Means 53
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct Offenses Relating to Weapons - Report
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing canceled
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM